Case: 22-0232
22-0232
03/24/2022
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE SALESFORCE.COM, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/22/2022 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's Reply Brief | Relator's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | |||||
10/24/2022 | Brief on the Merits | Real Parties in Interest | Real Parties in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane Doe #4, et al. | |||||
10/03/2022 | Brief on the Merits | Relator | Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | |||||
06/21/2022 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Relator | Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | |||||
06/06/2022 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Real Parties in Interest | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Jane Doe #4, et al. | |||||
03/24/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/20/2023 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
12/16/2022 | Motion to Stay Disposed | Filing dismissed as moot | Motion for Temporary Relief dismissed as moot | | ||||
12/16/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
11/22/2022 | Brief on the Merits | Relator's Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
10/28/2022 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits granted. Reply Brief due November 22, 2022. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. | | ||||
10/28/2022 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
10/24/2022 | Brief on the Merits | Real Parties in Interest's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Jane Doe #4, et al. | ||||||
10/03/2022 | Brief on the Merits | Relator's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
09/02/2022 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Relator's brief due no later than October 3, 2022; Response brief due October 24, 2022; Reply brief due November 8, 2022. |
| |||||
06/21/2022 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
06/06/2022 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Jane Doe #4, et al. | ||||||
05/18/2022 | Motion to withdraw disposed of | Filing granted | Motion to Withdraw for Kyle D. Hawkins is granted. |
| ||||
05/18/2022 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | Unopposed Motion to Withdraw for Kyle D. Hawkins filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
05/06/2022 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than June 6, 2022. |
| |||||
04/05/2022 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
03/25/2022 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion of Resident Attorney Allyson N. Ho in Support of Kristin A. Linsley's Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted. | | ||||
03/25/2022 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kristin A. Linsley is granted. |
| ||||
03/25/2022 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion of Resident Attorney Allyson N. Ho in Support of Kristin A. Linsley's Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
03/25/2022 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristin A. Linsley filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
03/24/2022 | Case Record Filed | Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
03/24/2022 | Motion to Stay Filed | Motion for Temporary Relief filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. | ||||||
03/24/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. |
| |||||
03/24/2022 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/20/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jane Doe #8 | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Warren W. Harris Mr. Walter Simons Mr. Bryan O. Blevins Jr. Mr. Jeffrey H. Richter Mr. Bradford Joe Gilde Ms. Annie McAdams Mr. David Harris Ms. Pamela McLemore Mr. Michael T. Gallagher |
Jane Doe #4 | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Annie McAdams Mr. Bryan O. Blevins Jr. Mr. Michael T. Gallagher Mr. Jeffrey H. Richter Mr. Walter Simons Mr. Warren W. Harris Mr. Bradford Joe Gilde Mr. David Harris Ms. Pamela McLemore |
Janiece Charlez, as representative on behalf of the estate of Natalie Irene Fisher | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Walter Simons Mr. Jeffrey H. Richter Ms. Annie McAdams Mr. Bryan O. Blevins Jr. Mr. Michael T. Gallagher Ms. Pamela McLemore Mr. Bradford Joe Gilde Mr. Warren W. Harris Mr. David Harris |
Salesforce.com, Inc. | Relator | Ms. Allyson N. Ho Mr. Stephen Hammer Ms. Katherine Montoya Mr. Michael Lawrence Raiff Ms. Kristin A. Linsley Mr. Bradley G. Hubbard Mr. William Stowe Ms. Kathrine Marie Silver Mr. Collin Ray Mr. Andrew P. LeGrand Sr. |
Jane Doe #12 | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Annie McAdams Mr. Jeffrey H. Richter Mr. David Harris Mr. Walter Simons Mr. Warren W. Harris Ms. Pamela McLemore Mr. Bradford Joe Gilde Mr. Michael T. Gallagher Mr. Bryan O. Blevins Jr. |
Jane Doe T.H.P. | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Jeffrey H. Richter Mr. David Harris Mr. Warren W. Harris Mr. Walter Simons Mr. Michael T. Gallagher Ms. Annie McAdams Ms. Pamela McLemore Mr. Bryan O. Blevins Jr. Mr. Bradford Joe Gilde |
Jane Doe #7 | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Michael T. Gallagher Mr. Bradford Joe Gilde Mr. Warren W. Harris Mr. Walter Simons Mr. David Harris Ms. Pamela McLemore Ms. Annie McAdams Mr. Jeffrey H. Richter Mr. Bryan O. Blevins Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-22-00045-CV
Denied
___ SW3d ___, 03-01-22
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Per Curiam
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
Honorable Mark D. Davidson
2020-28545-A