judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00145-CR
14-82-00145-CR
02/25/1982
Burglary
Lee, Robert aka Alvin Levine, Jr.
The State of Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/29/1983Mandate Issued
08/29/1983Mandate Issued
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/30/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/08/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
02/08/1983Case ready to be set
02/03/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/25/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/18/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/26/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
07/26/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
13,144
5 yrs.