Case: 01-89-00012-CR
01-89-00012-CR
01/06/1989
Habeas Corpus
McNeil, Lisa M. Ex Parte
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/19/1989 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/19/1989 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/15/1989 | Motion to publish opinion or order of court | Grant motion | |
06/14/1989 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
06/10/1989 | No petition for review or writ of error was filed | | |
05/26/1989 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
05/19/1989 | Motion to publish opinion or order of court | | |
05/11/1989 | Opinion issued | Grant motion | |
05/11/1989 | Opinion issued | Grant motion | |
03/16/1989 | Submitted | | |
03/16/1989 | Supplemental brief filed | | |
03/16/1989 | Submission | | |
03/16/1989 | Submitted | | |
03/01/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
02/14/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
02/14/1989 | Submission | | |
02/09/1989 | Motion strans disposed | Grant motion | |
02/09/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/09/1989 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
01/27/1989 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
01/24/1989 | Motion to amend record | | |
01/23/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
01/12/1989 | Statement of facts filed | | |
01/12/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
01/06/1989 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
01/06/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/19/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | James M. Leitner |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Linda West |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable Brian Rains
517,316