judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00036-CR
08-82-00036-CR
02/23/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Trent, Francis Richard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
06/08/1983Mandate Issued
03/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/29/1982Submitted
10/06/1982Submission
07/15/1982Brief Filed
06/30/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/05/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/24/1982Brief Filed
02/23/1982Exhibits Filed
02/23/1982Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
33951-243
99 Years