judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00220-CR
05-82-00220-CR
02/22/1982
Attempted Capital Murder
Guadalupe Ramirez Vargas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/22/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/30/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/17/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/12/1983Letter issued by the court
04/02/1983Letter received
03/18/1983Letter received
03/09/1983Letter issued by the court
03/07/1983Letter received
02/04/1983Letter received
01/01/1983Letter received
12/22/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
11/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/15/1982Letter received
10/28/1982Letter received
10/21/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/30/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/30/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/13/1982Letter received
08/13/1982Letter issued by the court
07/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/20/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/29/1982Reporters record filed
04/29/1982Clerks record filed
02/22/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/26/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vargas, Guadalupe RamirezCriminal - Appellant
The State of Texas Criminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 283rd District Court
F81-29283-SKT
Life