judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00028-CR
09-82-00028-CR
02/23/1982
Forgery
Johnson, Donald Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/1982Mandate Issued
08/04/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/20/1982Brief Filed
05/19/1982Brief Filed
05/10/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/17/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/23/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
39971
12 Years