judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERST (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 32916,32917,33199,33623,33624

Case Information: 33400
Short Caption:FERST (RICHARD) VS. STATE C/W 32916,32917,33199,33623,33624Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 32916 *, 32917 , 33199 , 33400, 33623 , 33624
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 128240Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00190
12/11/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 98-00350
03/25/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 3/23/99. 99-02157
03/25/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 01/20/99. 99-02427
04/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 01/20/99. 99-02428
07/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn4[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warrnted.] NNP99B-RR/C/DA. Nos. 32916, 32917, 33199, 33400, 33623, 33624. 00-11708
08/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13589
08/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 10, 2000. 00-13589