Case Heading (S-07-0243) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0243 | Case Docketed On: | 10/23/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15) | ||
Short Title: | MARY'S BAKE SHOPPE, AND MARY K. COONTS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS OWNER OF CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY v. CITY OF CHEYENNE, WYOMING, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION | ||||
Full Title: | MARY'S BAKE SHOPPE, AND MARY K. COONTS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS OWNER OF CERTAIN REAL PROPERTY, Appellants (Defendants), v. CITY OF CHEYENNE, WYOMING, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Mary's Bake Shop | Cary R. Alburn III |
Appellant | Mary K. Coonts | Cary R. Alburn III |
Appellee | City of Cheyenne, Wyoming, a Municipal Corporation | William G. Hibbler |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Other |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 116 |
Citation: | 193 P.3d 252 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/23/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/23/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/23/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
10/23/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
11/05/2007 | Correspondence - Incoming other. Received copy of letter from Cary R. Alburn to Gerrie Bishop regarding designation of record. | Correspondence | Incoming other | Final | |
12/03/2007 | Brief - Appellants; and received copy of brief on disk. | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/04/2007 | Motion - Other. Appellants' motion for order requiring district court to forward materials not filed in official court record. | Motion | Other | Final | |
12/06/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
12/18/2007 | Order - Granting motion for order requiring district court to forward materials not filed in official court record. | Order | Grant | Final | |
01/16/2008 | Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
01/17/2008 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
01/22/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Hibbler for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/22/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cary Alburn for appellants. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
02/04/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/12/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; volume III, exhibits; volume IV, In-Camera Records (Sealed). | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/04/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Cary R. Alburn, III for appellant; William G. Hibbler for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
03/04/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
10/22/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
10/22/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
10/22/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
10/22/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
10/29/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/27/08. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |