judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00118-CR
01-82-00118-CR
02/23/1982
Other Felony
Sullivan, Betty Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/05/1986Petition for writ of error disposed by Sup. CourtMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/28/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/03/1985Stay issuance of mandateMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
09/25/1985Stay issuance of mandate
09/09/1985Writ filed
08/01/1985Stay issuance of mandateGrant motion
07/25/1985Stay issuance of mandate
07/15/1985Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
07/10/1985Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
05/23/1985Motion for rehearing filed
05/08/1985No description available.Refused
10/22/1984No description available.
09/20/1984Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/14/1984Motion for rehearing filed
08/30/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/30/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/07/1983Submitted
10/31/1983Submission
09/26/1983Brief filed
09/22/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/12/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/04/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/28/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/14/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/05/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/09/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/31/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/03/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/23/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/23/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/28/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
338,543
2 years