judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00112-CV
14-82-00112-CV
02/24/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Daily, Bette Bettes
Wheat, John V., Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/07/1985Mandate Issued
06/07/1985Writ of Error DISPOSEDNo Reversible Error
12/03/1984Writ of Error FILED
11/01/1984Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
10/19/1984Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
10/02/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/10/1984AM CUR, OTHER,
03/18/1984Response to Reply Brief FILED
04/15/1983Response to Reply Brief FILED
03/28/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
03/23/1983Case ready to be set
02/24/1983Submission
09/03/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
08/26/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/10/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/16/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/08/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/18/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/26/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
03/11/1982No description available.GRANTED
03/11/1982Opposition filedOVERRULED
03/05/1982Opposition filed
02/24/1982No description available.
02/24/1982Transcript FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/07/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantEdward L. Noah
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Lance Beversdorff
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantBen H. Schleider, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeWill G. Dickey
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Taylor Moore
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantTalmage M. Guy
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 1
Harris
165423