judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00022-CV
09-82-00022-CV
02/24/1982
Miscellaneous civil
American National Insurance Co. of Texas
Montgomery, Violet P.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/16/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/22/1983Case stored
04/22/1983Mandate Issued
03/30/1983No Description Available.Refused
10/18/1982Petition for Writ
08/19/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
07/20/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
06/10/1982Brief Filed
04/23/1982Brief Filed
03/29/1982Supplemental Transcript filed
03/01/1982Statement of Facts Filed
02/24/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
60th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
B111,316