judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00092-CR
04-82-00092-CR
02/23/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Ellis, Michael Anthony
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/08/1985Higher Court DecisionRefused
12/19/1983Mandate Issued
12/19/1983Mandate Issued
10/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1983Submission
03/22/1983Submission
03/22/1983Submitted
03/04/1983Mot-Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/03/1983Mot-Oral Argument Filed
06/03/1982Brief Filed
06/03/1982Case ready to be set
05/10/1982Brief Filed
05/10/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/23/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/17/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/23/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/22/1982Record Approved
03/26/1981Record Filed
09/23/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CR-0928
Fifteen years confinement