judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00021-CV
09-82-00021-CV
02/24/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Mazzu, Josie
McCormack, Glen
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/1983Case stored
03/28/1983Mandate Issued
02/10/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1982Brief Filed
03/26/1982Brief Filed
02/24/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
60th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
B112,868