judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00153-CR
01-82-00153-CR
02/24/1982
Other Felony
Bogany, Robert Amos
State of Texas
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/1984Supplemental transcript filed
01/20/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/20/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/04/1984Motion for rehearing filedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/23/1983No description available.Reversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
06/22/1983No description available.Grant motion
04/11/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
03/10/1983Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
03/04/1983Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
02/17/1983Opinion issued
02/17/1983Opinion issued
02/17/1983Opinion issued
01/05/1983Submitted
01/05/1983Submission
01/05/1983Submitted
12/13/1982Submission
12/09/1982Motion to extend time to file sup brief dispGrant motion
12/01/1982Motion to extend time to file sup brief
08/23/1982Motion for rehearing filed
08/12/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/22/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
07/13/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/14/1982Record filed
02/24/1982Notice of appeal filed
02/24/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/20/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information