judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00232-CR
05-82-00232-CR
02/24/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Lenard Ray McCright
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/29/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/30/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/23/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/15/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
08/25/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
07/21/1983Letter issued by the court
07/20/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/29/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/29/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/30/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/30/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
05/07/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/28/1982Reporters record filed
04/28/1982Reporters record filed
04/28/1982Reporters record filed
04/28/1982Reporters record filed
04/28/1982Clerks record filed
02/24/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McCright, Lenard RayCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 291st District Court
F81-28604-MU
60 years & 51.00 court cost