judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00094-CV
04-82-00094-CV
02/25/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Parks, Raymond C.
McDougall, Rocky, d/b/a McDougall's Carrera Automotive
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/26/1984Mandate Issued
01/26/1984Mandate Issued
01/03/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
11/14/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedFiling is Moot
11/14/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/14/1983Response to Motion Filed
11/04/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/03/1983Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/27/1983No Motion was tendered for document received
09/14/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
09/12/1983Supplemental Brief Received
08/29/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/17/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
08/17/1983Supplemental Brief Received
08/17/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
03/31/1983Supplemental Authorities Received
03/22/1983Submission
03/22/1983Submission
03/22/1983Submitted
05/06/1982Requests Oral Argument
05/05/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/30/1982Case ready to be set
04/30/1982Brief Filed
04/30/1982Case ready to be set
04/08/1982Brief Filed
03/12/1982No Description Available.
02/25/1982No Description Available.
02/25/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/11/1982Appeal Bond Filed
01/14/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/26/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Bexar
135,735