judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00183-CV
04-82-00183-CV
02/23/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Boehly, Frank X., Jr.
Taylor, Ernestine and Taylor, Phillip Louis
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/14/1986No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/05/1983Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/20/1983Writ of Error filed
06/24/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/17/1983Response to Motion Filed
06/13/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/01/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/01/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/16/1983Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
04/29/1983Motion for Leave Filed
04/12/1983Submission
04/12/1983Submission
04/12/1983Submitted
03/01/1983Case ready to be set
03/01/1983Case ready to be set
05/06/1982Requests Oral Argument
05/06/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/30/1982Brief Filed
04/08/1982Brief Filed
04/08/1982No Description Available.
04/08/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/23/1982Appeal Bond Filed
02/12/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/14/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
158,354