judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLWELL (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 33401
Short Caption:COLWELL (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38375
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123476Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00191
01/08/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant appellant's proper person motion. fn1 [We direct the clerk to file appellant's proper person motion received on December 21, 1998]. Due Dates: Appoint counsel or retain counsel within 30 days. From appointment: enter appearance 15 days. fn2 [All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court]. 99-00115
01/08/1999MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Filed Proper Person Motion for Appointment of an Attorney, to Hold Briefing in Abeyance Pending Resolution of this Motion, and for a New Briefing Schedule. 98-00469
06/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Thomas J. Fitzpatrick shall have 10 days from the date of this order to enter a formal appearance with the clerk of this court or show cause why he should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with this court's order of January 8, 1999. 99-04985
06/17/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Thomas J. Fitzpatrick. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-05253
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Fitzpatrick shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, serve and file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript and within 20 days serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-09383
01/28/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. We hereby sanction attorney Thomas James Fitzpatrick $250. Fitzpatrick shall pay the sanction to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of further sanctions, including referral to the State Bar of Nevada for potential disciplinary action. Attorney Fitzpatrick shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, serve and file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript and 20 days to serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-01409
02/10/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Hand written).
02/10/2000Other Other. Received check #3455 for $250.00 from attorney Thomas J. Fitzpatrick re: order filed 1/28/00 imposing sanctions. Forwarded to Law Library.
02/11/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-02193
02/22/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-02734
02/24/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand and Appointment of Counsel. 00-02942
02/29/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Answer to Appellant's Motion for Remand and Appointment of Counsel. 00-03179
04/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this case to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this order." This order constitutes our final resolution of this appeal. Any subsequent challenge to the district court's decisioin on remand shall be docketed in this court as a new proceeding. fn2[We deny as moot Cowell's proper person motion, filed on January 8, 1999, to appoint an attorney, to hold briefing in abeyance, and to set a new briefing schedule.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-05763
05/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07598
05/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to the Federal Public Defender with copies of the Remittiturs in case nos. 32738 and 33401. 00-08101
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. 00-07598