judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ROBERTA J. PALMER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0244)
Case Number:S-07-0244Case Docketed On:10/24/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ROBERTA J. PALMER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ROBERTA J. PALMER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoberta J. PalmerDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 105
Citation:192 P.3d 125

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/24/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/24/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/10/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
01/22/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/12/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/26/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/22/2008Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
09/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for attorney fees and costs (requested signed original from counsel by e-mail)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - signed original, motion for attorney fees and expensesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
10/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/14/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/14/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/17/08 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal