judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATTERSON (DEQUAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33402
Short Caption:PATTERSON (DEQUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145401Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/17/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00192
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00318
05/17/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 5/14/99. 99-03985
05/17/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On July 21, 2000, this court received a proper person motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. Appellant states that he consents to the voluntary withdrawal of his appeal. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15268
08/30/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.