judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00088-CV
04-82-00088-CV
02/18/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Reeves, H. E.
Laredo Ready Mix, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/22/1984Mandate Issued
05/22/1984Mandate Issued
05/11/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/28/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/28/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/26/1983Submission
07/26/1983Submitted
05/13/1982Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/16/1982Case ready to be set
04/16/1982Brief Filed
04/16/1982Case ready to be set
03/26/1982Motion to Supplement Record Filed
03/22/1982Brief Filed
02/18/1982No Description Available.
02/18/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/15/1982Appeal Bond Filed
11/20/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
111th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Antonio Zardenetta
31,349