judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00083-CR
04-82-00083-CR
02/18/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mendez, Francisco Javier
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/19/1983Mandate Issued
08/19/1983Mandate Issued
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/16/1983Submission
03/16/1983Submission
03/16/1983Submitted
06/08/1982Case ready to be set
06/08/1982Brief Filed
06/08/1982Case ready to be set
05/10/1982Brief Filed
05/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
04/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/31/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/18/1982Record Approved
02/18/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/24/1981Record Filed
05/21/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
05/14/1981Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
80-CR-3361
Ten (10) years