judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00111-CR
01-82-00111-CR
02/22/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Grimes, Nathaniel Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/17/1983Brief filed
01/13/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/06/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/22/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
Honorable HENRY G. DALEHITE
37,284
23 years