judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00104-CR
01-82-00104-CR
02/22/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Bonner, Frank
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/10/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/10/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/22/1983Motion for leave to fileMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/22/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1983Supplemental brief filed
06/09/1983Motion to obtain record disposedGrant motion
01/27/1983Supplemental brief filed
01/20/1983Brief filed
01/17/1983Motion to extend time to file sup brief
01/06/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/26/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/22/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/09/1982Brief filed
05/14/1982Record filed
02/22/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/10/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
341,564
20 years