judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00204-CR
05-82-00204-CR
02/22/1982
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Johnny Cruz
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/20/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/20/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/26/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
06/01/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/20/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/17/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/20/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
05/28/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/11/1982Reporters record filed
05/11/1982Clerks record filed
02/22/1982Docketing statement filed
02/22/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
11/12/1981Sheriffs return of service
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 291st District Court
F81-11913-MKU
40 years TDC & 5000.00 fine