judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00019-CV
09-82-00019-CV
02/19/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Varela, Robert O.
American Petrofina, et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1983No Description Available.Reversed and Remanded
03/03/1983Petition for Writ
01/21/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/06/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/28/1982Brief Filed
05/04/1982Brief Filed
04/28/1982Supplemental Transcript filed
03/15/1982Statement of Facts Filed
02/19/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
58th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack A. Brookshire
A108,903