judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00096-CV
01-82-00096-CV
02/19/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Paternal Heirs of Howard Hughes
The Estate of Howard Robard Hughes, Jr., Deceased
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/02/1983Submission
07/25/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
06/24/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/19/1983Brief filed
05/19/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/19/1983Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
03/31/1983Motion for rehearing filed
03/31/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/31/1983Motion to substitute counsel
03/17/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/16/1983Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
02/02/1983Submitted
01/25/1983Brief filed
01/24/1983Brief filed
01/13/1983No description available.Grant motion
12/30/1982Motion for rehearing disposedGrant motion
12/30/1982Opinion issuedReinstate case after abatement
12/27/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
11/24/1982Motion for rehearing filed
11/24/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
11/11/1982Opinion issuedDismissed
11/01/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
11/01/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/25/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/19/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/15/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/15/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/27/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/15/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/20/1982Supplemental transcript filed
08/16/1982Statement of facts filed
07/29/1982Motion to dismiss appeal disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
07/15/1982Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/28/1982Memorandum of authorities
06/21/1982Memorandum of authorities
06/11/1982Motion to dismiss appeal
05/24/1982Opposition filed
05/07/1982Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
05/04/1982Motion to dismiss appeal
04/19/1982Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
03/04/1982Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/08/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
StateAppellant
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 2
Harris
139,362