judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00143-CR
05-82-00143-CR
02/03/1982
Rape
Byrum, Jerry Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/11/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/31/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
10/31/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/31/1983Mandate Issued
06/23/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/20/1983Letter issued by the court
06/16/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/16/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
05/17/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/13/1983Submitted
03/08/1983Submission
01/11/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/13/1982Brief Filed
09/13/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/11/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/27/1982Reporters record filed
04/27/1982Clerks record filed
02/03/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Kelly Wayne Loving
f81-31646-ms
Life, TDC