judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00026-CV
08-82-00026-CV
02/03/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Emro, Erika
Texas, State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
06/30/1982Mandate Issued
03/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/05/1982Brief Filed
03/05/1982Submitted
03/03/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/03/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/03/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/03/1982Supplemental Transcript Filed
03/02/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/01/1982No description available.
03/01/1982No description available.
02/25/1982Brief Filed
02/24/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/03/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/30/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
El Paso
Honorable Herbert E. Cooper
11779