judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00077-CV
01-82-00077-CV
02/01/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jack T. Little DBA Quality Truck Sales
State ofTexas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/29/1983No description available.
04/29/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/10/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/25/1983Motion for rehearing filed
02/10/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/10/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/17/1982Submitted
11/17/1982Submission
11/17/1982Submitted
10/29/1982Submission
07/09/1982Brief filed
07/07/1982Brief filed
05/17/1982Brief filed
04/16/1982Statement of facts filed
02/01/1982Transcript filed
02/01/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/29/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information