Case: 04-22-00491-CV
04-22-00491-CV
08/04/2022
Governmental Immunity
ModivCare Solutions, LLC formerly known as LogistiCare Solutions, LLC; and ModivCare Solutions, Inc. formerly known as Providence Service Corporation
Andrew Nathan Viera and Adela Garza
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/07/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
11/23/2022 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
11/23/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
11/23/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
11/23/2022 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||||
10/31/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
09/21/2022 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
09/21/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed in Part |
| ||||||
09/13/2022 | Order entered |
| |||||||
09/13/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||||
08/30/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
08/30/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
08/26/2022 | Order entered |
| |||||||
08/26/2022 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
08/23/2022 | Response filed |
| |||||||
08/23/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
08/15/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
08/11/2022 | Order entered |
| |||||||
08/11/2022 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
08/10/2022 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
| |||||||
08/10/2022 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
08/05/2022 | Internal memo | | |||||||
08/04/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
08/04/2022 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
08/03/2022 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||||
08/03/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
07/25/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/07/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ModivCare Solutions, LLC | Appellant | Stephanie James Jennie Knapp Spencer G. Markle |
Garza, Adela | Appellee | Spencer Breunig |
ModivCare Solutions, Inc | Appellant | Jennie Knapp Stephanie James Spencer G. Markle |
Viera, Andrew Nathan | Appellee | Parth Gejji Robert B. Evans III Jason F. DeSouza Lucas Williams Russell Stanley Post |
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Duval
Honorable Baldemar Garza
DC-20-17
Ramiro Hernandez