judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARNHARDT VS. CITY OF YERINGTON

Case Information: 33409
Short Caption:BARNHARDT VS. CITY OF YERINGTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR4960Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00211
01/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (mailed on: 01/26/99). 99-00568
02/10/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [On January 27, 1999, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. On February 2, 1999, appellant submitted a proper person "motion not to dismiss appeal." We deny the motions as moot.] SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-00911
03/24/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Appellant has submitted a proper person motion to to dismiss his appeal. We construe appellant's motion to be a petition for rehearing, and " . . . we deny rehearing." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02123
04/09/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02696
04/09/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 1999. 99-02696