judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENNIS PHILLIP SOBIN V. DARRIN SOBIN

Case Information: 10-FM-1126
Short Caption:DENNIS PHILLIP SOBIN V. DARRIN SOBINClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3586-02Filed Date:08/31/2010

Opening Event Date:08/31/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDennis Phillip Sobin Y
Arthur B. SpitzerYY
AppelleeDarrin P. SobinN
Todd S. KimNY
Stacy L. AndersonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/31/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)/MAT 11/6/09 2/19/10 4/29/10 6/3/10 6/28/10 8/12/10 (rt. ordered/copy sent to CRD)
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 31, 2010, and the statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC)
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/tape) 11/6/09 proc.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (20 pgs/tape) 2/19/10 proc.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (27 pgs/tape) 4/29/10 proc.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (133 pgs/tape) 6/3/10 proc.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (36 pgs/tape) 6/28/10 proc.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (9 pgs/tape) 8/12/10 proc. w/cd
11/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/09/2010RECORD INDEX
11/09/2010RECORD COPIES
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
12/13/2010MISCELLANEOUS - cert pusuant to rule 28(a)(2)
12/13/2010APPEARANCE of Arthur B. Spitzer as counsel for aplt
12/13/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/14/11. no oppo
12/17/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until completion of transcripts (titled as: motion to vacate briefing order) (no oppo)
12/29/2010ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to the extent that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcripts if filed with this court. It is F/O that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcripts. (JAC)
01/19/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (128pgs/Tape) 6/4/10 w/CD
01/26/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - aplt received ordered transcript
02/02/2011 On considertion of this court's December 29, 2010 order, directing appellant to file the brief within 40 days from the date the missing transcript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (JAC)
03/09/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (Atty Joseph Pace) Granted
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Arguing Attorney: Joseph Pace appearing Pro Bono - application for admission pending)
03/14/2011APPENDIX
03/29/2011ORDER GRANT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Joseph A. Pace, Esq., pro hac vice on behalf of appellant Dennis Sobin. (ETW)
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/18/11
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for extision of tim to file brief
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY to aplt's oppo to aple's mot for ext of time to file brief.
04/22/2011ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief shall be filed on or before May 18, 2011. (ETW)
05/16/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/17/11.
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to motion for ext of time.
06/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 17, 2011. No further request for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (ETW)
06/15/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 1, 2011
06/15/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (Arthur B. Spitzer as counsel for Appellant). Granted
06/16/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Appellee's Third Motion to Enlarge Time.
06/29/2011ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF on or before July 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. It is (MORE)
06/29/2011ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON and the appearance of Joseph Pace, Esq., is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record. It is F/O that Arthur B. Spitzer, Esq., remains as counsel of record for appellant. (ETW)
07/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
07/01/2011APPENDIX vol I thru II (supplemental)
07/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/27/2011FiledMotion To Expedite Appeal (Appellant)
07/27/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
09/14/2011FiledMiscellaneous - supp to motion to expedite consideration and disposition of this apeal. (Appellant)
09/26/2011LodgedReply - to aple's response to supplemental memorandum (Appellee)
09/27/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO EXPEDITE/SUPP TO MOTION/RESPONSE & MOTION TO DISMISS/REPLY
09/28/2011FiledOrder Granting APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL AS MOOT and DENYING MOTION TO EXPEDITE AS MOOT.
09/28/2011FiledDismissed
10/24/2011FiledMandate