Case: 02-22-00138-CV
02-22-00138-CV
04/20/2022
Mandamus
In re SVN Med, LLC, Sumit Rai, Kim De Mora, Chris Soviero, Ilan Reich, and Viatar CTC Solutions, Inc.
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/20/2022 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/01/2022 | Case stored | | |||||
06/10/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
06/08/2022 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||
05/26/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/25/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
05/20/2022 | Response filed |
| |||||
04/28/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
04/27/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
04/21/2022 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
04/21/2022 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
| |||||
04/21/2022 | Submitted | | |||||
04/20/2022 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/01/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Soviero, Chris | Relator | |
Pedestal SVN Investments, LLC | Real party in interest | Richard D. Hayes Donald R. White, Jr. Bryan J. Wick Patrick Canon Nick Nelson John W. Lilley III |
SVN Med LLC | Relator | |
Reich, Ilan | Relator | |
Haertling, Tiffany | Respondent | Hon. Tiffany Haertling |
Rai, Sumit | Relator | |
Viatar CTC Solutions, Inc. | Relator | Matthew G. Messerli |
De Mora, Kim | Relator |
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court
Denton
Honorable Tiffany Haertling
21-6505-442