judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-82-00012-CV
12-82-00012-CV
02/02/1982
Contract
Holden, Robert, Individually and d/b/a J & H Construction
McDonald Welding Services, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
09/04/1984
09/04/1984Mandate Issued
08/03/1984
07/19/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/15/1983Submitted
11/30/1983Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
11/17/1983Motion to Withdraw Attorney Filed
10/20/1983Submission
08/20/1982Brief Filed
07/08/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/21/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/01/1982Brief Filed
05/06/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/03/1982Response to Motion Filed
04/28/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/25/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/03/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/25/1982Disposition of MotionDismissed
02/18/1982
02/16/1982supplemental transcript filed
02/12/1982No Description Available.
02/03/1982Letter from the Court
02/02/1982Record Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
81-1902-A