judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00180-CR
04-82-00180-CR
02/04/1982
Other Felony
Dismore, Steve L.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
05/28/1982Brief Filed
05/28/1982Case ready to be set
04/30/1982Brief Filed
04/08/1982Record Filed
04/08/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/05/1982Record Approved
02/04/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Carolyn Spears Petersen
292043
25 Days