judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00053-CV
04-82-00053-CV
02/03/1982
Contract
National Rigging, Inc.
San Antonio, The City of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/08/1984Original Exhibits Returned
04/09/1984Mandate Issued
04/09/1984Mandate Issued
04/04/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
03/21/1984Order EnteredRefused
01/25/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
09/29/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/20/1983Writ of Error filed
08/22/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/04/1983Response to Motion Filed
07/28/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/13/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/13/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/21/1983Memorandum of Authorities Filed
03/16/1983Submission
03/16/1983Submission
03/16/1983Submitted
05/10/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1982No Description Available.
04/13/1982No Description Available.
04/08/1982Requests Oral Argument
04/07/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/30/1982Brief Filed
03/30/1982Case ready to be set
03/30/1982Case ready to be set
03/05/1982Brief Filed
02/03/1982Exhibits Filed
02/03/1982No Description Available.
02/03/1982No Description Available.
02/03/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/20/1982Appeal Bond Filed
10/27/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/08/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
79-CI-9373