Case: 24-0055
24-0055
01/22/2024
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
INWOOD NATIONAL BANK AND INWOOD BANCSHARES, INC., AND CHRISTY FAGIN
D. KYLE FAGIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE AND BENEFICIARY OF THE D. KYLE FAGIN QUALIFIED SUBCHAPTER S TRUST
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/22/2024 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Inwood National Bank, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than April 8, 2024. |
| |||||
02/06/2024 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
02/01/2024 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of D. Kyle Fagin, et al. | ||||||
01/23/2024 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
01/22/2024 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Inwood National Bank, et al. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/06/2024 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review | |
04/08/2024 | Response | Requested Response due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Inwood National Bank , et al. | Petitioner | Mr. Paul Talmage Boston Ms. K. Elizabeth Swan |
Fagin , D. Kyle | Respondent | Mr. Anthony L. Vitullo |
Fagin, Christy | Other interested party | Mr. Jeffrey E. Cook Mr. Matthew Jason Ankele |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-21-00878-CV
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt
___ SW3d ___, 10-09-23
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Bonnie Lee Goldstein
Trial Court Information
116th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tonya Parker
DC-20-01688