judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GADDA VS. DUNLAP

Case Information: 33408
Short Caption:GADDA VS. DUNLAPCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9606493Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/04/1998 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/01/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kevin J. Mirch, Ltd.--check no. 6012.
12/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00210
12/04/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/09/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Request for Transcript of Proceedings (No Transcript Requested). 98-00300
12/15/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00392
01/14/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties filed January 14, 1999, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NNP. Stipulation mailed on: 1/13/99. 99-00273