judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PBS ENTERPRIZES, INC. v. CWCAPITAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC AS SUCCESSOR TO CRIIMI MAE SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AS SPECIAL SERVICER FOR LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MERRILL LYNCH MORTGAGE INVESTORS, INC., MORTGAGE PASSTHROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 1997-C1

Case Heading (S-07-0251)
Case Number:S-07-0251Case Docketed On:10/29/2007
Linked To: S-07-0024
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:PBS ENTERPRIZES, INC. v. CWCAPITAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC AS SUCCESSOR TO CRIIMI MAE SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AS SPECIAL SERVICER FOR LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MERRILL LYNCH MORTGAGE INVESTORS, INC., MORTGAGE PASSTHROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 1997-C1
Full Title:PBS ENTERPRIZES, INC., Appellant (Defendant), v. CWCAPITAL ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC AS SUCCESSOR TO CRIIMI MAE SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AS SPECIAL SERVICER FOR LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MERRILL LYNCH MORTGAGE INVESTORS, INC., MORTGAGE PASSTHROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 1997-C1, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPBS Enterprizes, Inc.Timothy Charles Kingston
AppelleeCWCapital Asset Management, LLCColin M. Simpson
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverCarol W. StatkusCarol W. Statkus

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 53
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/31/2007Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
11/16/2007Response/Objection - Motion to Consolidate. Timely mailed on 11/14/07 using overnight mail, but wasn't received until today.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/20/2007Order - Consolidating cases for purposes of decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
12/07/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/18/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
01/23/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/24/2008Motion - Expedite - no action necessaryMotionBrief onlyFinal
02/04/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/06/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/09/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/28/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/28/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/29/08 by Joyce Boyer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal