judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00010-CV
09-82-00010-CV
02/02/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Shindler, James C.
Matthews, Jess
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/1983Case stored
03/28/1983Mandate Issued
02/02/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/06/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/12/1982Brief Filed
03/18/1982Brief Filed
03/02/1982Supplemental Transcript filed
02/16/1982Statement of Facts Filed
02/02/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
136th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack R. King
D105,897