judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Silicon Hills Campus LLC; WC Hirshfeld Moore, LLC; WC 805-809 East Sixth, LLC; WC 320 Congress, LLC; WC 901 East Cesar Chavez, LLC; WC 1212 East Sixth, LLC; WC 9005 Mountain Ridge, LLC; WC 103 East Fifth, LLC; and WC 422 Congress, LLC v. ATX Debt Fund 1, LLC; ATX Debt Fund 2, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings, LLC; Karlin Real Estate, LLC; Karlin Asset Management, Inc.; Pennybacker Capital, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings GP, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings, LP, Karlin Cesar Chavez, LLC; Karlin River Place, LLC; Karlin East Sixth, LLC; Karlin Mountain Ridge, LLC; Karlin Phillips Building, LLC; Karlin 320 Congress, LLC; and Karlin 422 Congress, LLC

Case: 03-24-00060-CV
03-24-00060-CV
01/24/2024
Real Property
Silicon Hills Campus LLC; WC Hirshfeld Moore, LLC; WC 805-809 East Sixth, LLC; WC 320 Congress, LLC; WC 901 East Cesar Chavez, LLC; WC 1212 East Sixth, LLC; WC 9005 Mountain Ridge, LLC; WC 103 East Fifth, LLC; and WC 422 Congress, LLC
ATX Debt Fund 1, LLC; ATX Debt Fund 2, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings, LLC; Karlin Real Estate, LLC; Karlin Asset Management, Inc.; Pennybacker Capital, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings GP, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings, LP, Karlin Cesar Chavez, LLC; Karlin River Place, LLC; Karlin East Sixth, LLC; Karlin Mountain Ridge, LLC; Karlin Phillips Building, LLC; Karlin 320 Congress, LLC; and Karlin 422 Congress, LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/27/2024Clerks record filed
02/27/2024Notice filed
02/27/2024Appearance of counsel
02/26/2024No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
02/26/2024Letter filed
02/21/2024Docketing statement filed
02/18/2024Fee paid
01/24/2024Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2024StatusHolding
03/28/2024StatusAppellant brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WC 901 East Cesar Chavez, LLC; WC 1212 East Sixth, LLC; WC 9005 Mountain Ridge, LLC; WC 103 East Fifth, LLC; and WC 422 Congress, LLCAppellantMr. Mitchell C. Shapiro
Mr. Brian Elliott
Congress Avenue Holdings, LP, Karlin Cesar Chavez, LLC; Karlin River Place, LLC; Karlin East Sixth, LLCAppelleeMr. Michael Roberts
Mr. Marco Pelayo
Karlin Mountain Ridge, LLC; Karlin Phillips Building, LLC; Karlin 320 Congress, LLC; and Karlin 422 Congress, LLCAppelleeMr. Christopher Dove
Ms. Monika Dziemianczuk
Mr. Michael Roberts
Mr. Marco Pelayo
Karlin Asset Management, Inc.; Pennybacker Capital, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings GP, LLCAppelleeMr. Michael Roberts
Mr. Marco Pelayo
Silicon Hills Campus LLC; WC Hirshfeld Moore, LLC; WC 805-809 East Sixth, LLC; WC 320 Congress, LLCAppellantMr. Mitchell C. Shapiro
Mr. Brian Elliott
ATX Debt Fund 1, LLC; ATX Debt Fund 2, LLC; Congress Avenue Holdings, LLC; Karlin Real Estate, LLCAppelleeMr. Marco Pelayo
Mr. Christopher Dove
Mr. Michael Roberts
Ms. Monika Dziemianczuk
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable Catherine Mauzy
D-1-GN-21-002896
Cynthia D. Spicer-Lewis