judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00079-CV
01-82-00079-CV
02/04/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
James Woody, Deceased and Eva Woody
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/29/1982Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/09/1982Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/26/1982Motion for rehearing filed
08/12/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1982Brief filed
04/23/1982Brief filed
02/04/1982Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
80,7388