judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00047-CR
04-82-00047-CR
02/01/1982
Other Drug Possession
Meyers, Floyd Miller
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
06/01/1983Brief Filed
05/26/1983Brief Filed
01/05/1983Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/03/1983Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
04/16/1982Brief Filed
03/29/1982Brief Filed
03/29/1982Case ready to be set
02/26/1982Brief Filed
01/28/1982Record Approved
01/28/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/24/1981Record Filed
02/17/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
80-CR-2341-A
Fifteen years