judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-07144-CV
08-81-07144-CV
07/15/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Hart, Tarzie, Guardian of Lance Brandon Meek, a Minor
Meek, Gloria, Administratrix of the Estate of John Francis
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/1984Shuck purged
06/28/1983Mandate Issued
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/04/1983Judgment IssuedDismissed
04/04/1983Submission
04/04/1983Submitted
04/04/1983Case ready to be set
01/15/1982Submitted
11/25/1981Submission
11/05/1981Brief Filed
10/28/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/28/1981Statement of Facts Filed
08/05/1981No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1981No description available.
07/15/1981Transcript Filed
07/07/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
County Court
Midland
6010