Case: 01-20-00383-CV
01-20-00383-CV
05/15/2020
Contract
OTC Global Holdings, LP,E Javier Loya, Joseph F.Kelly, Jr., and Emelda Beasley
John F. Klosek derivatively on behalf of OTS Global Holdings, LP
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/19/2020 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
08/14/2020 | Response due | | |||||||
08/14/2020 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
08/07/2020 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
08/04/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||||
08/04/2020 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
08/04/2020 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
08/03/2020 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/16/2020 | Notification received that no record was taken |
| |||||||
07/16/2020 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | Refused |
| ||||||
07/15/2020 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order |
| ||||||
07/15/2020 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||||
06/25/2020 | Motion filed |
| |||||||
06/11/2020 | Response filed |
| |||||||
05/26/2020 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
05/26/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||||
05/26/2020 | Sworn record filed |
| |||||||
05/26/2020 | Sworn record filed |
| |||||||
05/26/2020 | Sworn record filed |
| |||||||
05/25/2020 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||||
05/22/2020 | Opposition filed |
| |||||||
05/21/2020 | Response filed |
| |||||||
05/20/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
05/19/2020 | Document filed |
| |||||||
05/19/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
05/12/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/07/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
08/07/2026 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Loya, Javier E | Appellant | Arthur M. Nathan Kathryn Laflin Andrew J. Sarne |
OTC Global Holding, LP, a Delaware limited partnership | Appellant | Craig Lauchner Christopher Paul Hanslik |
Klosek, John F | Appellee | Varant Yegparian |
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 270th District Court
2019-88391
Court Reporter 270th District Court