judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1106
Short Caption:MAURICE JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9640-10Filed Date:08/31/2010

Opening Event Date:08/31/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice Jackson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Michelle Parikh Brown NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/31/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Christopher Pudelski, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appela. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christopher Pudelski, Esquire
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8pgs/Tape) 8/25/10 proc.
09/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (108pgs/Tape) 8/26/10 proc. w/CD included
09/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/05/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/20/2010ORDERED: Sua sponte, that the appointment of Christopher Pudelski, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Christopher Pudelski, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-apointed counsel forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix inclduing the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
10/25/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
11/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/07/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 20, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
12/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
12/23/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
12/23/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attached to brief)
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
01/24/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
02/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 25, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/24/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/28/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appdx
04/22/2011 ORDERED that APPELEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Delicatessen, Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
04/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and IS AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
05/05/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED