judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-07147-CV
08-81-07147-CV
07/24/1981
Automobile Personal Injury
Transportes Chihuahuenses, S.A.
Gill, Celina S., et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/25/1984Shuck purged
11/23/1981Mandate Issued
10/10/1981Judgment IssuedDismissed
10/10/1981Submission
10/10/1981Submitted
10/10/1981Case ready to be set
10/07/1981Miscellaneous Motion Disposed
10/02/1981No description available.
08/24/1981Transcript Filed
07/07/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/23/1981Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
65th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Edward Marquez
80-7133
n/a