Case: 14-88-00646-CV
14-88-00646-CV
07/29/1988
Mandamus/prohibition
Chien, Wally W.
Harmon, Melinda, Judge, 280th District Court, Harris County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
12/07/1988 | Case stored | | |
08/11/1988 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
08/11/1988 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
08/04/1988 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RES | DENIED | |
07/29/1988 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
07/29/1988 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES | | |
07/29/1988 | Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL | | |
07/29/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Jerry L. Spence |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Judge, 280th District Court |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Relator | Hon. Norris Dennard |
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris