judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MIKE OREN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1105
Short Caption:MIKE OREN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9956-10Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMike Oren YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Aaron Price, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Aaron Price, Esquire
09/16/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS Granted
09/23/2010ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON and the appointment of Aaron Price, Esquire, is hereby vacated, adn Ubong Akpan, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Aaron Price, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with thsi court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary to this appeal have been orderd and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: ETW)
09/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (50pgs/Tape) 7/30/10 proc. w/CD included
09/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/28/2010RECORD INDEX
09/28/2010RECORD COPIES
09/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 6/4/10)
10/04/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 30 days
11/04/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 15, 2010. (By: JAC)
12/15/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (no appendix)
12/28/2010 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on December 15, 2010, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before Decemer 15, 2010, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shallbe filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
12/30/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
12/30/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Appendix
01/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/20/2011APPENDIX
02/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE *****FILED AS THE BRIEF 4/22/11 LW
02/23/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - appellant's motion to amend brief OR for abeyance
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION - to aple's motion for summary affirmance
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION - to amend original brief or in the alternative a motion to hold the appeal in abeyance LW
04/22/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED...It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S ALTERNATIVE REQUEST IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file APPELLEE'S MOTION AS ITS BRIEF. It is ****MORE*****
04/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO AMEND THE ORIGIANL BRIEF...IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that appellant MAY FILE AN AMENDED BRIEF W/N 30 DAYS... (BROBST)
04/22/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF-SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 4/22/11 ORDER
04/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
05/23/2011APPENDIX
06/21/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to aplt's amended/corrected brief (no oppo)
06/21/2011RECEIVED - aple's response to aplt's amended/ corrected brief
07/14/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion for leave to file supplemental brief
07/14/2011FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/20/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - motion for oral argument out of time (Appellant)
09/21/2011LodgedMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
10/06/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
10/27/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing w/apppdx (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing and limited appendix
11/28/2011FiledMandate
01/23/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)